Docket for 22-7148
|
Jan 11 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 28, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Apr 04 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023. | | | Apr 07 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | | May 09 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | May 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. | | | May 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. | | |
|