Docket for 22-698
 | |
|
Nov 10 2022 | Application (22A427) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 24, 2022 to January 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentMain Document | Nov 15 2022 | Application (22A427) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 23, 2023. | | | Jan 23 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 27, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 26 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Apple, Inc. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Feb 13 2023 | Response Requested. (Due March 15, 2023) | | | Mar 01 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2023 to April 14, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 02 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 14, 2023. | | | Mar 15 2023 | Amicus brief of City of Berkeley submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 15 2023 | Amicus brief of Children’s Health Defense submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
|