Docket for 22-6838
|
Feb 15 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 24, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 28 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 02 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023. | | | Mar 08 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | | May 09 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | May 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. | | | May 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. | | |
|