SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-6815
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-6815
Title:
David E. Merry, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
February 17, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-12926)
Decision Date:
August 19, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
November 18, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 13 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 20, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Other
Mar 14 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2023 to April 19, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 15 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 19, 2023.
Apr 19 2023
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 02 2023
Reply of petitioner David E. Merry filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 03 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023.
May 22 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sheryl Joyce Lowenthal
Counsel of Record
Sheryl J. Lowenthal, Attorney at Law
221
East Government Street
Pensacola, FL 32502-6018
SJLOWENTHAL@APPEALS.NET
8509126710
Party name: David E. Merry
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##