Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-674
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-674
Vide 22-884
Title:Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:January 20, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-60262)
   Decision Date:December 1, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2023)
Jan 18 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2023 to March 24, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 24, 2023.
Mar 24 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed.
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves filed. (Distributed)
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-884 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Jun 30 2023Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 22-674. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 22-674. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jun 30 2023As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jul 27 2023Letter proposing a briefing schedule filed by the Solicitor General on behalf of the parties filed. VIDED.
Main Document
Aug 04 2023The briefing proposal set forth in the Solicitor General’s letter of July 27, 2023, is adopted. The Solicitor General shall file a consolidated opening brief on the merits, limited to 17,000 words, on or before August 29, 2023. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support, or in support of neither party, shall bear a light green cover. Petitioner in No. 22-674 and respondents in No. 22-884 may each file a response brief on the merits on or before October 18, 2023, and the briefs shall bear light red covers. Any brief of an amicus curiae in support shall bear a dark green cover. The Solicitor General shall file a consolidated reply brief limited to 9,000 words. VIDED
Aug 29 2023Brief of Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2023Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief of respondent Varinder Singh filed (as to 22-884).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief of petitioner Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves filed (as to 22-674).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief of respondent Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin filed. (as to 22-884)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Forty-Two Former Immigration Judges and Members of The Board of Immigration Appeals filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Brief amici curiae of Lucas Champollion, Brandon Waldon, Masoud Jasbi, Willow Parks, and Cleo Condoravdi filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Brief amici curiae of National Immigration Litigation Alliance, et al. filed (11/1/23). VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2023Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner in No. 22-674 and respondents in No. 22-884. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Motion for divided argument filed by petitioner in No. 22-674 and respondents in No. 22-884 DENIED. VIDED.
Nov 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Nov 17 2023Reply of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, January 8, 2024. VIDED.
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 06 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Jan 08 2024Argued. For Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General: Charles L. McCloud, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For petitioner in 22-674 and respondents in 22-884: Easha Anand, Stanford, Cal. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Raed Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Gonzalez Olivieri LLC
9920 Gulf Fwy.
Ste.100
Houston, TX 77034

rgonzalez@gonzalezolivierillc.com
(713) 481-3040
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves
Nadia AnguianoFederal Immigration Litigation Clinic
James H. Binger Center for New Americans, University of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Ave. S.
Minneapolis, MN 55455

angui010@umn.edu
(612) 301-8653
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves
Elizabeth Graber BentleyCivil Rights Appellate Clinic
University of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Avenue South
Minneapolis, MN 55455

EBENTLEY@UMN.EDU
612-625-7809
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves
Ross Alan MillerGonzalez Olivieri LLC
9920 Gulf Way Fwy, Suite 100
Houston, TX 77034

rmiller@gonzalezolivierillc.com
3152441098
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves
Amanda Lea WaterhouseWaterhouse Dominguez & Strom, PLLC
PO Box 671067
Houston, TX 77267

awaterhouse@wdslawyers.com
713-930-1430
Party name: Moris Esmelis Campos-Chaves
Attorneys for Respondent
Saad Ahmad
    Counsel of Record
Saad Ahmad and Associates
39111 Paseo Padre Pkwy
Fremont, CA 94538

saadahmadlawfirm@gmail.com
5107139847
Party name: Varinder Singh
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Christopher John Stender
    Counsel of Record
Federal Immigration Counselors, AZ
141 E. Palm Lane
Suite 112
Phoenix, AZ 85004

cjs@ficpcaz.com
6022545353
Party name: Raul Daniel Mendez-Colin
Other
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-3818
Party name: Forty-Two Former Immigration Judges and Members of The Board of Immigration Appeals
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPRICE@JENNER.COM
202-639-6873
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center, American Immigration Lawyers Association, American Immigration Council
Michael Daniel Reif
    Counsel of Record
Robins Kaplan LLP
800 LaSalle Avenue, Suite 2800
Minneapolis, MN 55402

mreif@robinskaplan.com
6123490171
Party name: Lucas Champollion, Brandon Waldon, Masoud Jasbi, Willow Parks, and Cleo Condoravdi
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400
Palo Alto, CA 94306

Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com
650-858-6062
Party name: National Immigration Litigation Alliance et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543