Docket for 22-6736
|
Feb 03 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 13, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 13, 2023 to April 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 12, 2023. | | | Apr 12 2023 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Apr 25 2023 | Reply of petitioner Justin Martin filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 26 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | | May 09 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | May 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. | | | May 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. | | |
|