Docket for 22-6683
|
Oct 21 2022 | Application (22A340) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 29, 2022 to January 30, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Oct 27 2022 | Application (22A340) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 30, 2023. | | | Jan 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 3, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 22 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 3, 2023 to April 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 24 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 3, 2023. | | | Apr 03 2023 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 04 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. | | Main Document | Apr 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023. | | | Apr 11 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. | | | May 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | |
|