Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-666
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-666
Title:Situ Kamu Wilkinson, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:January 20, 2023
Linked with 22A516
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3166)
   Decision Date:September 19, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 08 2022Application (22A516) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 18, 2022 to February 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Dec 08 2022Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 12 2022Application (22A516) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 17, 2023.
Jan 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2023)
Feb 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2023 to March 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Feb 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 23, 2023.
Mar 16 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 23, 2023 to May 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 5, 2023.
May 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2023 to May 12, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
May 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 12, 2023.
May 12 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in response to the petition for certiorari filed.
May 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/15/2023.
May 30 2023Reply of petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson filed. (Distributed)
Jun 09 2023Rescheduled.
Jun 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jun 30 2023As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Jul 24 2023Motion for an extension of time for the filing of the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 29, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 18, 2023.
Aug 10 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2023Brief of petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Organizations Assisting Survivors of Domestic Violence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Oct 12 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 28, 2023.
Oct 13 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit.
Oct 18 2023Brief of respondent Garland, Attorney General of the United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 19 2023CIRCULATED
Oct 19 2023Electronic record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit.
Nov 17 2023Reply of petitioner Situ Kamu Wilkinson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2023Argued. For petitioner: Jaime A. Santos, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Colleen R. Sinzdak, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jsantos@goodwinlaw.com
202-346-4000
Party name: Situ Kamu Wilkinson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Attorney General of the United States
Other
Lee Turner Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
2000 K Street NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

ltfriedman@kramerlevin.com
202-775-4526
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Thomas Gregory Sprankling
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400
Palo Alto, CA 94306

Thomas.Sprankling@wilmerhale.com
650-858-6062
Party name: Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

ZACK.TRIPP@WEIL.COM
(202) 682-7000
Party name: Organizations Assisting Survivors of Domestic Violence

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543