Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-6640
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-6640
Vide 22-6389
Title:Eugene Jackson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 26, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-13963)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 27, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixOtherProof of Service
Feb 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 27, 2023 to March 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2023.
Feb 27 2023Brief amicus curiae of Clause 40 Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2023Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 29 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Mar 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 06 2023Rescheduled.
Apr 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023.
Apr 13 2023Reply of petitioner Eugene Jackson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
May 15 2023Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 22-6389 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
May 25 2023Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 22-6389. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 22-6389. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Oct 12 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, November 27, 2023. VIDED.
Oct 13 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit.
Oct 16 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Oct 17 2023Record received from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Oct 19 2023CIRCULATED
Nov 27 2023Argued. For petitioner Brown: Jeffrey T. Green, Washington, D. C. For petitioner Jackson: Andrew Adler, Assistant Federal Public Defender, Fort Lauderdale, Fla. For respondent: Austin Raynor, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

ANDREW_ADLER@FD.ORG
954-356-7436
Party name: Eugene Jackson
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Douglas Eugene Litvack
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001-4412

DLITVACK@JENNER.COM
202-637-6357
Party name: Clause 40 Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543