Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-660
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-660
Title:Trevor Murray, Petitioner
v.
UBS Securities, LLC, et al.
Docketed:January 18, 2023
Linked with 22A438
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4202, 21-56)
   Decision Date:August 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:September 15, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 11 2022Application (22A438) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2022 to January 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Nov 16 2022Application (22A438) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 13, 2023.
Jan 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 17, 2023 to March 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 20, 2023.
Feb 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 17 2023Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley, et al. filed. (April 13, 2023) (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2023Brief of respondents UBS Securities, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 05 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 05 2023Reply of petitioner Trevor Murray filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 24 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023.
May 01 2023Petition GRANTED.
May 05 2023Motion for an extension of time for the filing of the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 27, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2023.
Jun 27 2023Brief of Trevor Murray not accepted for filing. (To be corrected and reprinted)
Jun 27 2023Brief of petitioner Trevor Murray filed. (Docketed July 13, 2023)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Whistleblower Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2023Amicus brief of Senator Chalres Grassley & Senator Ron Wyden not accepted for filing. (July 05, 2023 - Duplicate submission)
Jun 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Senator Chalres Grassley, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
Jul 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 05 2023Brief amici curiae of The Anti-Fraud Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 14 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 10, 2023.
Jul 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit.
Jul 21 2023Sealed material from the USDC, S. Dist., NY available with the Clerk.
Jul 27 2023CIRCULATED
Jul 27 2023Record from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit electronically received and available with the Clerk.
Aug 08 2023Brief of respondents UBS Securities, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Human Resource Management filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Railroads filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 07 2023Reply of petitioner Trevor Murray filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 10 2023Argued. For petitioner: Easha Anand, Stanford, Cal.; and Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Eugene Scalia, Washington, D. C.
Feb 08 2024Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. Alito, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Barrett, J., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Lloyd Herbst
    Counsel of Record
Herbst Law, PLLC
420 Lexington Avenue
Suite 300
New York, NY 10170

rherbst@herbstlawny.com
(914) 450-8163
Party name: Trevor Murray
Easha AnandStanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

EANAND@STANFORD.EDU
(650) 724-3345
Party name: Trevor Murray
Attorneys for Respondents
Eugene Scalia
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ESCALIA@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(202) 955-8673
Party name: UBS Securities, LLC, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Samuel John Buffone Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Black & Buffone PLLC
1400 Eye St. NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

SAM@BLACKANDBUFFONE.COM
2029978562
Party name: The Anti-Fraud Coalition; the National Employment Lawyers Association; Better Markets Inc.
Thomas Michael Devine
    Counsel of Record
Government Accountability Project
1612 K Street, NW, #1100
Washington, DC, DC 20902

TOMD@WHISTLEBLOWER.ORG
240-888-4080
Party name: U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley
Adam William Hansen
    Counsel of Record
333 Washington Avenue North
Suite 300
Minneapolis, MN 55401

ADAM@APOLLO-LAW.COM
(612) 927-2969
Party name: Academy of Rail Labor Attorneys
Alan Robert KabatBernabei & Kabat, PLLC
1400 - 16th Street, N.W., Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036-2223

KABAT@BERNABEIPLLC.COM
202-745-1942
Party name: U.S. Senator Charles E. Grassley
Stephen M. Kohn
    Counsel of Record
Kohn, Kohn and Colapinto, LLP
1710 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

sk@kkc.com
9148827730
Party name: National Whistleblower Center
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

AMETLITSKY@OMM.COM
2123262000
Party name: Airlines for America
David Michael MorrellJones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

rproctor@jonesday.com
2028793636
Party name: American Association of Railroads
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

ABMORRISON@LAW.GWU.EDU
2029947120
Party name: Senator Chalres Grassley & Senator Ron Wyden
Donald James Munro
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

dmunro@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: American Association of Railroads
Adam Ross Pulver
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th St. NW
Washington, DC 20009

APULVER@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-7790
Party name: Public Citizen
Christopher F. Robertson
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
Two Seaport Lane
Boston, MA 02210

crobertson@seyfarth.com
6179464989
Party name: The Society for Human Resource Management
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

DAVID.SALMONS@MORGANLEWIS.COM
202-373-6283
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

KSHANMUGAM@PAULWEISS.COM
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543