Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-655
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-655
Title:Dan Sulgrove, et al., Petitioners
v.
Spokane Indian Tribe, et al.
Docketed:January 13, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-35502)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 12, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2023Waiver of right of respondent Dawn Mining Company to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 13 2023Waiver of right of respondent State of Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 13 2023Waiver of right of respondent Federal Respondents to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023.
Mar 20 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Peter Guillum Scott
    Counsel of Record
Peter G. Scott Law Offices PLLC
682 South Ferguson Ave.
Suite 4
Bozeman, MT 59718

peter@scott-law.com
(406) 585-3295
Party name: Dan Sulgrove, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Peter Benjamin Gonick
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General of Washington
1125 Washington St SE
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504

PETERG@ATG.WA.GOV
3607536245
Party name: State of Washington
Shane R. Swindle
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie Brown and Bain P.A.
2901 North Central Ave.
Suite 2000
Phoenix, AZ 85012

SSWINDLE@PERKINSCOIE.COM
6023518384
Party name: Dawn Mining Company
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543