SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-6391
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-6391
Title:
Nonami Palomares, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
December 23, 2022
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(21-40247)
Decision Date:
November 2, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 23, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 17 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 23, 2023 to February 22, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 22, 2023.
Jan 20 2023
Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 23 2023
Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 27 2023
Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Feb 01 2023
Reply of petitioner Nonami Palomares filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 02 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 21 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023.
Feb 22 2023
Letter from counsel for petitioner with new authority filed.
Main Document
Other
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott Andrew Martin
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street
Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002
scott_martin@fd.org
713-7184600
Party name: Nonami Palomares
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
David John Debold
Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036
DDEBOLD@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(202) 955-8500
Party name: FAMM
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##