Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-617
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-617
Title:Franciszek Krazsztof Bystron, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:January 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2971, 21-1807)
   Decision Date:May 24, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 4, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 6, 2023)
Jan 03 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 19 2023Docketing Notice of Franciszek Bystron not accepted for filing. (February 01, 2023)
Jan 27 2023Waiver of right of respondent Garland, Merrick B. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Feb 14 2023Response Requested. (Due March 16, 2023)
Mar 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2023 to April 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 17, 2023.
Apr 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2023 to May 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 17, 2023.
May 17 2023Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.
May 25 2023Reply of petitioner Franciszek Bystron filed.
May 30 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 received.
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sandra Greene
    Counsel of Record
Greenefitzgerald Advocates
313 W. Liberty Street
Suite 8
Lancaster, PA 17603

sandralgreene998@cs.com
(717) 755-8188
Party name: Franciszek Bystron
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick B.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543