Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-6123
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-6123
Title:Brian David Hill, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 21, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-6325, 22-6501)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 24, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 07 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 21 2022Request for recusal received from petitioner.
Main DocumentOther
Nov 30 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 06 2022Supplement to recusal filed.
Main DocumentOther
Dec 08 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian David Hill310 Forest Street
Apt. 2
Martinsville, VA 24112

276-790-3505
Party name: Brian David Hill
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543