Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-6054 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-6054 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Stephen Barbee, Petitioner
v.
Bryan Collier, et al.
Docketed:November 15, 2022
Linked with 22A424
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-70011)
   Decision Date:November 11, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 14 2022Application (22A424) for stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed.
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2022Response to application from respondent Bryan Collier, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2022Brief of Bryan Collier, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 16 2022Application (22A424) referred to the Court.
Nov 16 2022Petition DENIED.
Nov 16 2022Application (22A424) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Alito and by him referred to the Court is denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.
Nov 16 2022Reply of Stephen Barbee submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of A. Richard Ellis
75 Magee Ave.
Mill Valley, CA 94941

a.r.ellis@att.net
4153896771
Party name: Stephen Barbee
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Matthew Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548, Capito Station
Austin, TX 78711

stephen.hoffman@oag.texas.gov
5129361400
Party name: Bryan Collier, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543