SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-601
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-601
Title:
Peter Lake, Chairman, Public Utility Commission of Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Incorporated, et al.
Docketed:
December 30, 2022
Linked with 22A440
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-50160)
Decision Date:
August 30, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2022
Application (22A440) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2022 to December 28, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Nov 18 2022
Application (22A440) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 28, 2022.
Dec 28 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 30 2023
Brief of respondents NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Incorporated, et al. in opposition filed. (Docket entry corrected 2/7/22 to show this as a brief in opposition not brief in support)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2023
Brief of respondent Southwestern Public Service Company in support filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2023
Brief amicus curiae of ITC Holdings Corp. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2023
Brief of respondent Entergy Texas, Inc. in support filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 13 2023
Reply of petitioners Chairman Peter Lake, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 15 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023.
Mar 06 2023
The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Judd Edward Stone II
Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548
judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Chairman Peter Lake, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lino Mendiola III
Counsel of Record
Eversheds Sutherland (US ) LLP
600 Congress Ave.
Suite 2000
Austin, TX 78701
LINOMENDIOLA@EVERSHEDS-SUTHERLAND.COM
5127212700
Party name: Entergy Texas, Inc.
Matthew Eben Price
Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001
MPRICE@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Southwestern Public Service Company
Stuart H. Singer
Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
401 East Las Olas Boulevard
suite 1200
fort lauderdale, FL 33301
SSINGER@BSFLLP.COM
9543560011
Party name: NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Incorporated, et al.
Other
Aaron Michael Streett
Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002
AARON.STREETT@BAKERBOTTS.COM
7132291855
Party name: ITC Holdings Corp.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##