Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-5999
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-5999
Title:Enrique M. Flores-Vazquez, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:November 7, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2022-1587)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 29 2022Motion (22M30) for leave to proceed as a veteran filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jul 29 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 7, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 19 2022MOTION (22M30) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022Motion (22M30) for leave to proceed as a veteran Denied.
Dec 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent McDonough, Denis to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 08 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Enrique M. Flores-Vazquez421 21st Street NW
Naples, FL 34120

(239) 293-8352
Party name: Enrique M. Flores-Vazquez
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543