Docket for 22-5828
|
Oct 11 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 14, 2022) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 09 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2022 to December 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 10 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2022. | | | Dec 14 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 29 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023. | | | Jan 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023. | | | Jan 18 2023 | Letter respondent United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed) | | Main Document |
|