Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-581
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-581
Title:Heidi R. Steward, Acting Director, Oregon Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Frank E. Gable
Docketed:December 22, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35427, 19-35436)
   Decision Date:September 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 20 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 23, 2023 to March 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 17, 2023.
Mar 16 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Frank E. Gable.
Main Document
Mar 16 2023Brief of respondent Frank E. Gable in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 17 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Mar 24 2023Reply of petitioner Heidi R. Steward, Acting Director, Oregon Department of Corrections filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
Apr 17 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023.
Apr 24 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Apr 24 2023Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Heidi R. Steward, Acting Director, Oregon Department of Corrections
Attorneys for Respondent
Nell I. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
101 SW Main Street
Suite 1700
Portland, OR 97204

NELL_BROWN@FD.ORG
5033262123
Party name: Frank E. Gable

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543