Docket for 22-566
 | |
|
Dec 16 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2023) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 06 2023 | Brief of respondent Richard Estle Carson III in support filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 10 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2023 to February 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2023, for all respondents. | | | Jan 17 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Manhattan Institute filed (also in 22-554). VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 17 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 18 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Center for American Liberty filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 03 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 21, 2023 to March 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 06 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 10, 2023, for all respondents. | | | Mar 10 2023 | Brief of respondents Kathryn Hyland, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceProof of Service | Mar 10 2023 | Brief of respondents Navient Corporation and Navient Solutions, LLC in opposition filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 28 2023 | Reply of William Yeatman submitted. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 29 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023. | | |
|