Docket for 22-559
|
Oct 26 2022 | Application (22A357) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 10, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions | Oct 28 2022 | Application (22A357) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 10, 2022. | | | Nov 28 2022 | Application (22A357) to extend further the time from December 10, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Written Request | Dec 07 2022 | Application (22A357) denied by Justice Thomas. | | | Dec 12 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 20 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Ice Portal, Inc. (Shiji) to respond filed. | | Main Document | Dec 28 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023. | | | Jan 17 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|