Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-555
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-555
Title:NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas
Docketed:December 19, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-51178)
   Decision Date:September 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 15 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2022Response to petition from respondent Ken Paxton, Attorney General of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2022Letter dated December 20, 2022, from counsel for respondent filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2023Reply of petitioners NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 23 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Aug 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 28 2023Supplemental brief of respondent Angela Colmenero, in her Official Capacity as Provisional Attorney General of Texas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Aug 30 2023Supplemental brief of petitioners NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller LLP
200 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lehotskykeller.com
(512) 693-8350
Party name: NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lanora Christine Pettit
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Texas Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

lanora.pettit@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Angela Colmenero, in her Official Capacity as Provisional Attorney General of Texas
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543