Aug 10 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 14, 2022) |
| Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service |
Sep 12 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 14, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 13 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 14, 2022. |
| |
Sep 28 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 14, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 30 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 14, 2022. |
| |
Nov 14 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Nov 29 2022 | Reply of petitioner Gary Paul Karr filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Dec 01 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. |
| |
Jan 03 2023 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Jan 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023. |
| |
Jan 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023. |
| |
Jan 18 2023 | Letter of respondent United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed) |
| Main Document |