Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-53
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-53
Title:Aaron G. Filler, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:July 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1552)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 19, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Aaron Gershon Filler
    Counsel of Record
Tensor Law P.C.
900 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 314
Santa Monica, CA 90401

afiller@tensorlaw.com
310 621-1983
Party name: Aaron Filler, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543