Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-529
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-529
Title:Alex Cantero, et al., Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Petitioners
v.
Bank of America, N.A.
Docketed:December 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-400, 21-403)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 05 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 9, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 06 2023Waiver of right of respondent Bank of America, N.A. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 17 2023Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2023)
Feb 16 2023Brief of respondent Bank of America, N.A. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Mar 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023.
Mar 08 2023Reply of petitioners Alex Cantero, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Aug 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Sep 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Sep 13 2023Supplemental brief of petitioners Alex Cantero, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Oct 26 2023Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 8, 2023. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 18, 2024. Petitioners will file the reply brief no later than February 16, 2024.
Dec 01 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Alex Cantero, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2023Brief of petitioners Alex Cantero, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2023Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Flagstar Plaintiffs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amici curiae of Conference of State Bank Supervisors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States supporting vacatur filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, February 27, 2024.
Jan 08 2024Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Jan 10 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 17 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief of respondent Bank of America, N.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor Dori K. Bailey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Brief amici curiae of The Bank Policy Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Brief amicus curiae of Joseph R. Mason filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Brief amicus curiae of Flagstar Bank, N.A. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Comptrollers of the Currency and senior OCC officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit and available with the Clerk.
Feb 01 2024Record received electronically from the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York and available with the Clerk.
Feb 16 2024Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 16 2024Reply of petitioners Alex Cantero, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Argued. For petitioners: Jonathan E. Taylor, Washington, D. C.; and Malcolm L. Stewart, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Lisa S. Blatt, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Ellis Taylor
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

jon@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Alex Cantero, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Lisa S. Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: Bank of America, N.A.
Mark W. MosierCovington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

MMOSIER@COV.COM
202-662-5435
Party name: Bank of America, N.A.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steve W. Berman
    Counsel of Record
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
1301 Second Avenue
Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98101

steve@hbsslaw.com
206-623-7292
Party name: Flagstar Plaintiffs
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

SHAY.DVORETZKY@SKADDEN.COM
202-371-7370
Party name: United States Chamber of Commerce
Jonathan Yates Ellis
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
888 16th Street N.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006

JELLIS@MCGUIREWOODS.COM
(202) 828-2887
Party name: Flagstar Bank, N.A.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJAY@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464190
Party name: Former Comptrollers of the Currency and Senior OCC Officials
Stefan L. Jouret
    Counsel of Record
Jouret LLC
265 Franklin Street
Suite 1702
Boston, MA 02110

jouret@jouretllc.com
617-523-0133
Party name: Conference of State Bank Supervisors; American Association of Residential Mortgage Regulators
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

AMETLITSKY@OMM.COM
2123262000
Party name: Joseph R. Mason
Louis Orbach
    Counsel of Record
Bond, Schoeneck et al.
One Lincoln Center
Syracuse, NY 13202

lorbach@bsk.com
315-218-8000
Party name: Professor Dori K. Bailey
Adina H. Rosenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

AROSENBAUM@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-7720
Party name: Public Citizen, Consumer Federation of America, National Association of Consumer Advocates, National Consumer Law Center, and Public Justice
Matthew A. Schwartz
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

schwartzmatthew@sullcrom.com
(212) 558-4000
Party name: The Bank Policy Institute, American Bankers Association, Consumer Bankers Association, Mortgage Bankers Association, and Mid-Size Bank Coalition of America
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543