SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-517
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-517
Vide 22-389, 22-566, 22-634
Title:
Jenna Dickenson, Petitioner
v.
Charles T. Johnson, et al.
Docketed:
December 5, 2022
Linked with 22A343
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(18-12344)
Decision Date:
September 17, 2020
Rehearing Denied:
August 3, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2022
Application (22A343) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2022 to December 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Oct 26 2022
Application (22A343) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 1, 2022.
Dec 01 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 09 2022
Waiver of right of respondent Charles Johnson to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 18 2023
Response Requested. (Due February 17, 2023)
Feb 13 2023
Brief of respondent Charles Johnson in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023.
Mar 03 2023
Reply of petitioner Jenna Dickenson filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2023
Rescheduled.
Mar 29 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Alan Isaacson
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Eric Alan Isaacson
6580 Avenida Mirola
La Jolla, CA 92037-6231
ericalanisaacson@icloud.com
858-263-9581
Party name: Jenna Dickenson
Attorneys for Respondents
Ashley Conrad Keller
Counsel of Record
Keller Postman LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100
Chicago, IL 60606
ack@kellerpostman.com
3127415222
Party name: Charles Johnson
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##