Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-5063
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-5063
Title:Michael A. Tulipat, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 11, 2022
Linked with 21A576, 22A344
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-2259)
   Decision Date:January 13, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 22 2022Application (21A576) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 13, 2022 to June 12, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Apr 05 2022Application (21A576) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 12, 2022.
Jun 10 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 10, 2022)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Aug 02 2022Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 04 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until October 24, 2022, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Oct 17 2022Application (22A344) for an extension of time within which to comply with the order of October 3, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 26 2022Application (22A344) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 23, 2022.
Dec 21 2022Application (22A344) for a further extension of time within which to comply with the order of October 3, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written Request
Dec 23 2022Application (22A344) granted by The Chief Justice further extending the time to file until January 2, 2023.
Dec 23 2022Petitioner complied with order of October 3, 2022.
Jan 12 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael A. Tulipat9140 Champney Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89148

Party name: Michael Tulipat
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543