Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-502
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-502
Title:Spring Valley Produce, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Nathan Aaron Forrest, et al.
Docketed:November 30, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-12133)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 28 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2022Waiver of right of respondents Nathan Aaron Forrest, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 17 2023Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2023)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Reno Frank Relle Fernandez III
    Counsel of Record
Complex Appellate Litigation Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

reno.fernandez@calg.com
(415) 649-6700
Party name: Spring Valley Produce, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

DANIEL.GEYSER@HAYNESBOONE.COM
303-382-6219
Party name: Nathan Aaron Forrest, et al.
Christopher D. SmithSmith Law
1561 Lakefront Drive, Suite 204
Sarasota, FL 34240

smith@chrissmith.com
941-202-2222
Party name: Nathan Aaron Forrest, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543