SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 22-497
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 22-497
Title:
Jasper Robin Chen, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:
November 28, 2022
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
Case Numbers:
(PD-0096-21, PD-0097-21)
Decision Date:
August 24, 2022
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2022
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2022)
Petition
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2022
Waiver of right of respondent Texas to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 06 2023
Response Requested. (Due February 6, 2023)
Jan 27 2023
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 03 2023
Stipulation to the dismissal of the case under Rule 46.1 filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Feb 14 2023
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark William Bennett
Counsel of Record
Bennett & Bennett
917 Franklin Street, Fourth Floor
Houston, TX 77002
MB@IVI3.COM
7132241747
Party name: Jasper Chen
Lane Andrew Haygood
Bailey & Galyen
3800 E. 42nd Street
Ste 110
Odessa, TX 79762
lhaygood@galyen.com
4328035800
Party name: Jasper Chen
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548
JUDD.STONE@OAG.TEXAS.GOV
512-936-1700
Party name: Texas
Patricia McLean
Harris County District Attorney's Office
1201 Franklin Street, 6th Floor
Houston, TX 77002
McLean_Patricia@dao.hctx.net
713-274-5826
Party name: Texas
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##