Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-493
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-493
Title:Erica Bojicic, dba Evolve Dance Company, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Richard Michael DeWine, Individually and in His Official Capacity as the Governor of Ohio, et al.
Docketed:November 23, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-4123)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2022Waiver of right of respondents Richard DeWine, Amy Acton, Lance Himes, Stephanie McCloud, Bruce Vanderhoff, State of Ohio to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 02 2022Waiver of right of respondent Mysheika Roberts, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Columbus Public Health to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2022Waiver of right of respondents Toledo-Lucas County Health Commissioner Eric Zgodzinski to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2022Waiver of right of respondent Melba R. Moore, former Health Commissioner for the City of Cincinnati to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 08 2022Waiver of right of respondent Terry Allan, Health Commissioner, Cuyahoga County Board of Health to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 12 2022Waiver of right of respondents Donna Skoda, David Covell, Joseph Mazzola, Peter Schade and Kirkland Norris to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023.
Jan 17 2023Supplemental Brief of petitioners Erica Bojicic, dba Evolve Dance Company, LLC, et al., filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Jan 17 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert John Gargasz
    Counsel of Record
Robert J. Gargasz Co., LPA
1670 Cooper Foster Park Road
Suite C
Lorain, OH 44053

rjgargasz@gmail.com
(440) 960-1670
Party name: Erica Bojicic, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Richard DeWine, Amy Acton, Lance Himes, Stephanie McCloud, Bruce Vanderhoff, State of Ohio
Kevin Andrew Pituch
    Counsel of Record
Lucas County Prosecutor's Office
700 Adams
Toledo, OH 43614

kpituch@co.lucas.oh.us
419.213.2001
Party name: Toledo-Lucas County Health Commissioner Eric Zgodzinski
Frank H. Scialdone
    Counsel of Record
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder Co.
100 Franklin's Row
34305 Solon Road
Cleveland, OH 44139

fscialdone@mrrlaw.com
440-248-7906
Party name: Donna Skoda, David Covell, Joseph Mazzola, Peter Schade and Kirkland Norris
Richard N. CoglianeseColumbus City Attorney's Office
77 N. Front Street
Columbus, OH 43215

mcoglianese@columbus.gov
614-645-0818
Party name: Mysheika Roberts, individually and in her official capacity as Health Commissioner, Director of Columbus Public Health
Jake A. ElliottCuyahoga County Prosecutor's Office, Civil
The Justice Center, Courts Tower
1200 Ontario Street, 8th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44113

jelliott@prosecutor.cuyahogacounty.us
216-443-5756
Party name: Terry Allan, Health Commissioner, Cuyahoga County Board of Health
Erica FaaborgCity of Cincinnati Solicitor's Office
801 Plum Street, Room 214
Cincinnati, OH 45202

erica.faaborg@cincinnati.gov
513-352-3309
Party name: Melba R. Moore, former Health Commissioner for the City of Cincinnati

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543