Docket for 22-465
 | |
|
Aug 29 2022 | Application (22A195) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 12, 2022 to November 14, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Aug 31 2022 | Application (22A195) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until November 14, 2022. | | | Nov 14 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 02 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 16, 2022 to January 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 05 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 27, 2023, for all respondents. | | | Jan 27 2023 | Brief of respondent Weyerhaeuser Company in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 27 2023 | Brief of respondent International Paper Company in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023. | | | Feb 15 2023 | Reply of petitioners Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 06 2023 | The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States. | | |
|