Docket for 22-434
 | |
|
Sep 08 2022 | Application (22A219) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 20, 2022 to October 6, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Sep 13 2022 | Application (22A219) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 6, 2022. | | | Sep 26 2022 | Application (22A219) to extend further the time from October 6, 2022 to November 19, 2022, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Written RequestProof of Service | Oct 05 2022 | Application (22A219) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 7, 2022. | | | Nov 07 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2022) | | PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Nov 16 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 9, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 17 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 9, 2023. | | | Jan 09 2023 | Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 23 2023 | Reply of petitioner Slade Moore filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 25 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Feb 21 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|