Docket for 22-425
 | |
|
Nov 04 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 7, 2022) | | PetitionCertificate of Word Count | Nov 17 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 7, 2022 to January 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 18 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 6, 2023. | | | Dec 20 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 6, 2023 to February 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 21 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 6, 2023. | | | Feb 06 2023 | Brief of respondents Carolyn Maloney, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023. | | | Feb 22 2023 | Reply of petitioner Robin Carnahan, Administrator of the General Services Administrator filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. | | | Mar 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023. | | | Apr 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023. | | | Apr 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023. | | | Apr 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. | | | May 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | | May 15 2023 | Petition GRANTED. | | |
|