Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-414
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-414
Title:Timothy R. Bonner, et al., Petitioners
v.
Leigh Chapman, in Her Official Capacity as Acting Secretary of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2022
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Middle District
   Case Numbers:(14 MAP 2022, 15 MAP 2022, 17 MAP 2022, 18 MAP 2022, 19 MAP 2022)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2022Waiver of right of respondents Butler County Republican Committee; York County Republican Committee; and Washington County Republican Committee to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2022Waiver of right of respondent Leigh M. Chapman, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and the Pennsylvania Department of State to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 02 2022Waiver of right of respondents Democratic National Committee and Pennsylvania Democratic Party to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory H. Teufel
    Counsel of Record
OGC Law, LLC
1575 McFarland Rd.
Pittsburgh, PA 15216

gteufel@ogclaw.net
4122534622
Party name: Timothy Bonner, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas W. King III
    Counsel of Record
Dillon McCandless King Coulter & Graham, LLP
128 West Cunningham Street
Butler, PA 16001

tking@dmkcg.com
724-283-2200
Party name: Butler County Republican Committee; York County Republican Committee; and Washington County Republican Committee
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

daniel.volchok@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Democratic National Committee and Pennsylvania Democratic Party
Robert Andrew Wiygul
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rwiygul@hangley.com
(215) 496-7042
Party name: Leigh M. Chapman, in her official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and the Pennsylvania Department of State

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543