Docket for 22-412
 | |
|
Oct 28 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2022) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Nov 10 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2022 to January 1, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 3, 2023. See Rule 30.1. | | | Nov 28 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Roy Harness, et al. | | Blanket Consent | Nov 28 2022 | Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Michael Watson, Mississippi Secretary of State | | Blanket Consent | Dec 02 2022 | Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. and American Civil Liberties Union filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 02 2022 | Brief amici curiae of Dennis Hopkins, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 02 2022 | Brief amicus curiae of Campaign Legal Center filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 03 2023 | Brief of respondent Michael Watson, Mississippi Secretary of State in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 17 2023 | Reply of petitioners Roy Harness, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 18 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023. | | | Feb 16 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Feb 21 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/24/2023. | | | Feb 21 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Feb 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023. | | | Feb 28 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Mar 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/17/2023. | | | Mar 13 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Mar 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/24/2023. | | | Mar 20 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Mar 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/31/2023. | | | Mar 27 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2023. | | | Apr 10 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 17 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/21/2023. | | | Apr 17 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Apr 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/28/2023. | | | Apr 25 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | May 08 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023. | | | May 09 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | May 15 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/18/2023. | | | May 22 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/25/2023. | | |
|