Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-373
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-373
Title:David Schaszberger, et al., Petitioners
v.
American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13
Docketed:October 20, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2172)
   Decision Date:July 20, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2022Waiver of right of respondent AFSCME Council 13 to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022.
Nov 14 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Brian Kirk Kelsey
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

bkelsey@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: David Schaszberger, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jacob Raffel Karabell
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street, N.W. Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jkarabell@bredhoff.com
2028422600
Party name: AFSCME Council 13

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543