Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-367
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-367
Title:Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Petitioner
v.
Cooperative de Ahorro y Credito Abraham Rosa, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1119)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 17 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2022)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Nov 03 2022Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2022Motion of Oscar Adolfo Mandry-Aparicio, et al. to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022The motions to extend the time to file responses are granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2022, for all respondents.
Dec 12 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 19, 2022 to January 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 9, 2023, for all respondents.
Jan 09 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 09 2023Brief of respondent Suiza Dairy, Corp. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 09 2023Brief of respondents Oscar Adolfo Mandry-Aparicio, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.
Jan 25 2023Reply of petitioner Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-3000
Party name: Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Attorneys for Respondents
Russell A. Del Toro
    Counsel of Record
Russell A. Del Toro Sosa Law Office
2 Calle Washington Apt. 304
San Juan, PR 00907

rdeltoro@dtslaw.com
7875296502
Party name: PFZ Properties, Inc.
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Rafael Antonio Gonzalez-Valiente
    Counsel of Record
Godreau & Gonzalez Law, LLC
Calle McLeary 1806
Suite 1-B
San Juan, PR 00911

rgv@g-glawpr.com
787-726-0077
Party name: Suiza Dairy, Corp.
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Oscar Adolfo Mandry-Aparicio, et al.
Robert H. ThomasPacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Ste 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

rthomas@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Oscar Adolfo Mandry-Aparicio, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543