Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-360
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-360
Title:Veteran Warriors, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:October 18, 2022
Linked with 22A202
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1378)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 17, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2022Application (22A202) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 15, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 06 2022Application (22A202) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 14, 2022.
Oct 14 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 17, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2022 to December 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2022.
Nov 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 29 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 19, 2022 to January 18, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 18, 2023.
Jan 18 2023Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veteran Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2023Reply of petitioner Veteran Warriors, Inc., et al. filed.(Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/17/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Robert Franzinger
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K St. NW
Washington, DC 20005

mfranzinger@sidley.com
2027368583
Party name: Veteran Warriors, Inc., Andrew D. Sheets, Kristie Sheets
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

202-514-2217
Party name: Secretary of Veteran Affairs
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc., Jewish War Veterans of the United States of America, Inc., and National Defense Committee
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: The Federal Circuit Bar Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543