Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-293
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-293
Title:Anthony Novak, Petitioner
v.
City of Parma, Ohio, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2022
Linked with 21A834
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3290)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2022Application (21A834) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2022 to September 26, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief in Opposition to Petitioner's Application for Extension of Time to File a Petition for Writ of Certiorari submitted.
Main Document
Jun 21 2022Application (21A834) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 26, 2022.
Sep 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 28, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 28, 2022 to November 28, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 03 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Onion filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 28, 2022.
Oct 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Babylon Bee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2022Brief amicus curiae of Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2022 to January 11, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 11, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Patrick Michael Jaicomo
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

pjaicomo@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Anthony Novak
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Christopher Orest Rezie
    Counsel of Record
Gallagher, Sharp, et al.
1215 Superior Avenue
7th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44114

rrezie@gallaghersharp.com
216-241-5310
Party name: City of Parma, Ohio, et al.
Other
Thomas J. Eastmond
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Knight LLP
Three Park Plaza
Suite 1400
Irvine, CA 92614-8537

thomas.eastmond@hklaw.com
(949) 833-8550
Party name: Rutherford Institute
Joshua Tyler Morris
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Avenue SE
Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

JT.Morris@thefire.org
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Mass. Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2024257499
Party name: Cato Institute
Emmett Eugene Robinson
    Counsel of Record
Robinson Law Firm LLC
6600 Lorain Ave. #731
Cleveland, OH 44102

erobinson@robinsonlegal.org
(216) 505-6900
Party name: The Babylon Bee
Stephen James van Stempvoort
    Counsel of Record
Miller Johnson
45 Ottawa Avenue SW., Suite 1100
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

vanstempvoorts@millerjohnson.com
616-831-1765
Party name: The Onion

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543