Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-277
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-277
Title:Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al., Petitioners
v.
NetChoice, LLC, dba NetChoice, et al.
Docketed:September 23, 2022
Linked with 22A131
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-12355)
   Decision Date:May 23, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 11 2022Application (22A131) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2022 to September 21, 2022, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 17 2022Application (22A131) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 21, 2022.
Sep 21 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 24, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Netchoice, LLC, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2022Brief amicus curiae of Donald J. Trump filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 21 2022Brief amici curiae of Ohio, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Attorney General, Florida, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 24 2022Brief amici curiae of Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief of respondents Netchoice, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alan B. Morrison filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Freedom X filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of Philip Hamburger in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2022Reply of petitioners Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al., filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Dec 29 2022Rescheduled.
Jan 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/20/2023.
Jan 23 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Aug 14 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the Solicitor General in her brief for the United States as amicus curiae.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Henry Charles Whitaker
    Counsel of Record
Florida Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

henry.whitaker@myfloridalegal.com
8504143688
Party name: Ashley Moody, Attorney General of Florida, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

paul.clement@clementmurphy.com
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Netchoice, LLC, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Iowa, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah
Michael Jason HendershotOhio Attorney General's Office
30 E. Broad Street, 17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

michael.hendershot@ohioago.gov
614.466.8980
Party name: States of Ohio, Alabama, Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, Idaho, Iowa, Kentucky, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Texas, and Utah
Mitchell Keiter
    Counsel of Record
Keiter Appellate Law
The Beverly Hills Law Building, 424 South Beverly Drive
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

mitchell.keiter@gmail.com
13105538533
Party name: Freedom X
Richard Lawson
    Counsel of Record
Gardner Brewer Hudson
400 N. Ashley Dr.
Tampa, FL 33602

rlawson@gardnerbrewer.com
813-952-8882
Party name: Donald J. Trump
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Philip Hamburger
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Alan B. Morrison
Eric Schnapper
    Counsel of Record
Univ. of Washington School of Law
P.O. Box 353020
Seattle, WA 98195

schnapp@uw.edu
206-616-3167
Party name: Reynaldo Gonzalez, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543