Docket for 22-237
 | |
|
Sep 09 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2022) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Sep 19 2022 | Waiver of right of respondents Rachel Glover, Lancaster County Treasurer & Lancaster County to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 07 2022 | Waiver of right of respondent Douglas J. Peterson, Attorney General of Nebraska to respond filed. | | Main Document | Oct 13 2022 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New England Legal Foundation. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Oct 18 2022 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Sandra K. Nieveen filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Oct 25 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/10/2022. | | | Oct 26 2022 | Response Requested. (Due November 25, 2022) | | | Nov 10 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 25, 2022 to December 6, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 14 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2022, for all respondents. | | | Dec 06 2022 | Brief of respondent TAX 106, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 15 2022 | Reply of petitioner Sandra K. Nieveen filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 21 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023. | | | Jan 09 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/13/2023. | | |
|