Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-216
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-216
Title:Terry C. Cooley, Petitioner
v.
California Statewide Law Enforcement Association, et al.
Docketed:September 9, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16498)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2022Waiver of right of respondent California Statewide Law Enforcement Association to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Terry Cooley
Attorneys for Respondents
Christopher M. KolkeyDowney Brand LLP
621 Capitol Mall
Sacramento, CA 95814

ckolkey@downeybrand.com
91-444-1000
Party name: California Statewide Law Enforcement Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543