Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-213
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-213
Title:Delores Polk, et al., Petitioners
v.
Betty Yee, in Her Official Capacity as State Controller of California, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-17095, 20-55266)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2022)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2022Waiver of right of respondents Service Employees International Union Local 2015; United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930 to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 04 2022Waiver of right of respondent Betty Yee, in her official capacity as State Controller of California to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 19 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/4/2022.
Nov 07 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Delores Polk, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Anya Binsacca
    Counsel of Record
CA Atty. General's Office
455 Golden Gate Ave.
Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

anya.binsacca@doj.ca.gov
4155104417
Party name: Betty Yee, in her official capacity as State Controller of California
Stacey Monica Leyton
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

sleyton@altber.com
4154217151
Party name: Service Employees International Union Local 2015; United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME Local 3930

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543