Jul 07 2022 | Application (22A20) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 19, 2022 to September 2, 2022, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Jul 14 2022 | Application (22A20) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 2, 2022. |
| |
Aug 30 2022 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2022) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Sep 28 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 3, 2022 to November 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Sep 30 2022 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 2, 2022. |
| |
Nov 02 2022 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Nov 22 2022 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/9/2022. |
| |
Nov 22 2022 | Reply of petitioner Adam Samia filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Dec 13 2022 | Petition GRANTED. |
| |
Jan 25 2023 | Brief of petitioner Adam Samia filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jan 25 2023 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Jan 31 2023 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 29, 2023. |
| |
Feb 01 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 01 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 01 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Retired Federal Judges and Former Federal Prosecutors filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 01 2023 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 02 2023 | Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by Law Professors. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Feb 03 2023 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. for the Second Circuit. |
| |
Feb 06 2023 | All records from the USCA-2nd Circuit were transmitted electronically (including sealed materials). Record request forwarded to the USDC-Southern District of New York. |
| |
Feb 13 2023 | CIRCULATED |
| |
Feb 24 2023 | Brief of respondent United States of America filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Feb 27 2023 | Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by Law Professors GRANTED. |
| |
Mar 03 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Pennsylvania, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 10 2023 | Sealed records received from the USDC-Southern District of New York (1 envelope). The remaining record is available on PACER. |
| |
Mar 17 2023 | Reply of petitioner Adam Samia filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Mar 29 2023 | Argued. For petitioner: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Caroline A. Flynn, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. |
| |