Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-193
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-193
Title:Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow, Petitioner
v.
City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al.
Docketed:August 31, 2022
Linked with 21A835
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2975)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2022Application (21A835) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2022 to September 1, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 21 2022Application (21A835) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until September 1, 2022.
Aug 29 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2022Waiver of right of respondent City of St. Louis, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/28/2022.
Oct 11 2022Response Requested. (Due November 10, 2022)
Oct 31 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 10, 2022 to December 12, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 01 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2022.
Dec 12 2022Brief of respondents City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Dec 20 2022Reply of petitioner Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/6/2023.
Jan 09 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 01 2023Supplemental brief of respondents City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED limited to the following question: Does Title VII prohibit discrimination in transfer decisions absent a separate court determination that the transfer decision caused a significant disadvantage?
Jul 07 2023Motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 11, 2023.
Aug 28 2023Brief of petitioner Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2023Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 31 2023Brief amici curiae of Professor Suja A. Thomas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2023Brief amici curiae of The National Employment Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2023Brief amici curiae of The Legal Aid Society and The National Employment Law Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of District of Columbia, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2023Brief of respondent City of St. Louis filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 6, 2023.
Oct 12 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 17 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit.
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Human Resource Management filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of National School Boards Association, AASA, The Superintendents Association, and Association of School Business Officials International filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc., Restaurant Law Center, Inc., and National Retail Federation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of State of Arkansas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Local Government Legal Center, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, and International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2023CIRCULATED
Oct 30 2023Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 09 2023Reply of petitioner Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. The record is available with the Clerk (one box).
Dec 06 2023Argued. For petitioner: Brian Wolfman, Washington, D. C.; and Aimee W. Brown, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondents: Robert M. Loeb, Washington, D. C.
Apr 17 2024Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Sotomayor, Gorsuch, Barrett, and Jackson, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., Alito, J., and Kavanaugh, J., each filed an opinion concurring in the judgment.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Wolfman
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown Law Appellate Courts Immersion Clinic
600 New Jersey Avenue
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20001

wolfmanb@georgetown.edu
202-661-6582
Party name: Jatonya Clayborn Muldrow
Attorneys for Respondents
Sheena Renee Hamilton
    Counsel of Record
City of St. Louis Civil Law Department
1200 Market Street, Room 314
St. Louis, MO 63103

HamiltonS@stlouis-mo.gov
314-622-3361
Party name: City of St. Louis
Robert Mark LoebOrrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

RLOEB@ORRICK.COM
202-339-8475
Party name: City of St. Louis, Missouri, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

NICHOLAS.BRONNI@ARKANSASAG.GOV
501-682-6302
Party name: State of Arkansas, et al.
James Patrick Davy
    Counsel of Record
All Rise Trial & Appellate
P.O. Box 15216
Philadelphia, PA 19125

jimdavy@allriselaw.org
(215) 792-3579
Party name: The Legal Aid Society and The National Employment Law Project
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center, American Civil Liberties Union, and American Civil Liberties Union of Missouri
Amanda Kellar Karras
    Counsel of Record
International Municipal Lawyers Association
51 Monroe St., Suite 404
Rockville, MD 20850

akarras@imla.org
(202) 466-5424
Party name: Local Government Legal Center, National Association of Counties, National League of Cities, and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Richard B. Lapp
    Counsel of Record
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
233 South Wacker Drive
Suite 8000
Chicago, IL 60606

rlapp@seyfarth.com
(312) 460-5914
Party name: The Society for Human Resource Management
Francisco Maria Negron Jr.
    Counsel of Record
National School Boards Association
1680 Duke St.
Alexandria, VA 22314

fnegron@nsba.org
7038386722
Party name: National School Boards Association, AASA, The Superintendents Association, and Association of School Business Officials International
Suja Aley Thomas
    Counsel of Record
University of Illinois College of Law
504 E. Pennsylvania Avenue
Champaign, IL 61820

sathomas@illinois.edu
3126076158
Party name: Professor Suja A. Thomas, et al.
Lucas Cody Townsend
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ltownsend@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3731
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc., Restaurant Law Center, Inc., and National Retail Federation
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: District of Columbia, et al.
Carolyn L. Wheeler
    Counsel of Record
Katz Banks Kumin LLP
11 Dupont Circle NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

wheeler@katzbanks.com
(202) 299-1140
Party name: The National Employment Lawyers Association, The NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., and The National Women’s Law Center
Carolyn L. Wheeler
    Counsel of Record
Katz Banks Kumin LLP
11 Dupont Circle
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036

wheeler@katzbanks.com
(202) 299-1140
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association
Julie Marie Wilson
    Counsel of Record
800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

JULIE.WILSON@NTEU.ORG
703-352-3325
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543