Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-160
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-160
Title:Kevin L. Fair, Petitioner
v.
Continental Resources, et al.
Docketed:August 22, 2022
Linked with 21A729
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Nebraska
   Case Numbers:(S-21-074)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2022Application (21A729) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 11, 2022 to August 10, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main Document
May 23 2022Application (21A729) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 10, 2022.
Jul 25 2022Application (21A729) to extend further the time from August 10, 2022 to August 19, 2022, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Written Request
Jul 28 2022Application (21A729) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until August 19, 2022.
Aug 18 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Kevin L. Fair
Blanket Consent
Sep 09 2022Waiver of right of respondents Scotts Bluff County, Heather Hanschild to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 16 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Taxpayers Union Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2022Waiver of right of respondent Continental Resources to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 20 2022Waiver of right of respondent Doug Peterson, Attorney General for the State of Nebraska to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 21 2022Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by PioneerLegal, LLC.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Cato Institute, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 21 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by AARP and AARP Foundation.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/14/2022.
Sep 28 2022Response Requested. (Due October 28, 2022)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christina Marie Martin
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
4440 PGA Blvd., Suite 307
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

cmartin@pacificlegal.org
561-691-5000
Party name: Kevin L. Fair
Attorneys for Respondents
James A. Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Nebraska Attorney General's Office
2115 State Capitol
Lincoln, NE 68509

jim.campbell@nebraska.gov
402-471-2682
Party name: Doug Peterson, Attorney General for the State of Nebraska
Dave EubanksScotts Bluff County Attorney's Office
1725 10th Street
Gering, NE 69341

308-436-6674
Party name: Scotts Bluff County, Heather Hanschild
Casandra M. LangstaffKoley Jessen P.C., LLO
1125 S. 103rd St., Suite 800
Omaha, NE 98116

casandra.langstaff@koleyjessen.com
402-390-9500
Party name: Continental Resources
Other
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#650
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Clark M. Neily III
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Mass. Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

cneily@cato.org
2024257499
Party name: Cato Institute
William Alvarado Rivera
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation
601 E Street, NW,
Washington, DC 20049

warivera@aarp.org
7037480717
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Stephanie Schuster
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

stephanie.schuster@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: PioneerLegal, LLC

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543