Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-142
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-142
Title:Federacion de Maestros de Puerto Rico, Inc., Petitioners
v.
Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.
Docketed:August 15, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1080)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 13, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2022)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Letter received from Federacion de Maestros de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Main Document
Aug 22 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 14, 2022 to October 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 23 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 14, 2022.
Aug 23 2022Certificate of Service of Federacion de Maestros de Puerto Rico, Inc., et al. not accepted for filing. (September 14, 2022 -- Document not of type that is to be efiled)
Oct 14 2022Brief of respondents Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Representative for the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/18/2022.
Nov 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jessica Esther Mendez
    Counsel of Record
Bufete Emmanuelli, C.S.P.
P.O. Box 10779
Ponce, PR 00732

jessica@emmanuelli.law
787-848-0666
Party name: Federacion de Maestros de Puerto Rico, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-4530
Party name: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, as Representative for the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543