Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-133
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-133
Title:Lakshmi Arunachalam, Petitioner
v.
Kronos Incorporated
Docketed:August 11, 2022
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1948)
   Decision Date:June 1, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2022Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 12, 2022)
AppendixPetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 31 2022Waiver of right of respondent Kronos Incorporated to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 07 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/28/2022.
Oct 03 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lakshmi Arunachalam222 Stanford Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025

(650) 690-0995
Party name: Lakshmi Arunachalam
Attorneys for Respondent
William C. Saturley
    Counsel of Record
Preti Flaherty Beliveau & Pachios, PLLP
PO Box 1318
57 North Main Street
Concord, NH 03302-1318

wsaturley@preti.com
603-410-1557
Party name: Kronos Incorporated

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543