Docket for 22-1225
 | |
|
Jun 16 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2023) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jul 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 21, 2023 to August 21, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jul 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 21, 2023. | | | Aug 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2023 to September 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Aug 14 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 5, 2023. | | | Sep 05 2023 | Brief for respondents Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Sep 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023. | | | Oct 10 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023. | | | Oct 23 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023. | | | Oct 30 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023. | | | Nov 06 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. | | | Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. | | | Nov 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023. | | | Dec 01 2023 | Rescheduled. | | | Dec 01 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023. | | |
|