Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-1219
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-1219
Title:Relentless, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Commerce, et al.
Docketed:June 16, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1886)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 17, 2023 to August 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 16, 2023.
Jul 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation and the Defense of Freedom Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2023Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 09 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2023 to September 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 15, 2023.
Sep 15 2023Brief of respondents U.S. Department of Commerce, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Reply of petitioners Relentless, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 10 2023Rescheduled.
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 13 2023Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al. DENIED.
Oct 13 2023Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition. The Clerk is directed to establish a briefing schedule that will allow this case to be argued in tandem with No. 22-451, Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. v. Raimondo, Sec. of Comm., et al. in the January 2024 argument session.
Oct 18 2023The joint appendix and petitioners’ brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Monday, November 20, 2023. Respondents’ brief on the merits is to be filed on or before Friday, December 15, 2023. The reply brief is to be filed on or before Friday, January 5, 2024.
Oct 27 2023Amicus curiae briefs filed on the merits in No. 22-451, Loper Bright Enterprises, et al. v. Raimondo, Sec. of Comm., et al., will be considered in connection with this case.
Nov 08 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Relentless, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 17 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, January 17, 2024.
Nov 20 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Nov 20 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit.
Nov 20 2023Brief of petitioners Relentless, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2023Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Nov 27 2023Brief amicus curiae of Aditya Bamzai in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Brief amici curiae of Former State Supreme Court Justices Andrew W. Gould, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 27 2023Brief amicus curiae of New England Fishermen's Stewardship Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Brief amicus curiae of Ohio Chamber of Commerce filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 27 2023Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2023CIRCULATED
Dec 01 2023Record received from the United States District Court for the District of Rhode Island. The record is electronic and is available with the Clerk.
Dec 15 2023Brief of respondents U.S. Department of Commerce, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Emory Intellectual Property Society and Law, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Dr. Reshma Ramachandran, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of Historians Gautham Rao, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Environmental Defense Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Reply of petitioners Relentless, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2024Argued. For petitioners: Roman Martinez, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Elizabeth B. Prelogar, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
The New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-2411

john.vecchione@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2029186902
Party name: Relentless, Inc., et al.
Roman Martinez VLatham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

ROMAN.MARTINEZ@LW.COM
202-637-3377
Party name: Relentless, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Department of Commerce, et al.
Other
Aditya Bamzai
    Counsel of Record
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

abamzai@law.virginia.edu
434-243-0698
Party name: Aditya Bamzai
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue & Goldberg, LLP
1008 Pennsylvania Ave., SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: Environmental Defense Fund
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel
2575 E. Camelback Road
Suite 860
Phoenix, AZ 85016

densign@holtzmanvogel.com
602-388-1262
Party name: Former Arizona Supreme Court Justice Andrew W. Gould et al.
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Emory Law School Supreme Court Advocacy Program
1301 Clifton Rd NE
Atlanta, GA 30322

PAUL.KOSTER@EMORY.EDU
4047273957
Party name: Emory Intellectual Property Society and Law and Artificial Intelligence Society
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

TOM@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
7032439423
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation and the Defense of Freedom Institute
Victoria Stewart Nugent
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

vnugent@democracyforward.org
2024489090
Party name: Dr. Reshma Ramachandran and Dr. Joseph S. Ross
Larry James Obhof Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Shumaker, Loop and Kendrick LLP
41 South High Street
Suite 2400
Columbus, OH 43215

LOBHOF@SHUMAKER.COM
(614) 463-9441
Party name: Ohio Chamber of Commerce
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street NW
Suite 643-A
Washington, DC 20037

JTORCHINSKY@HOLTZMANVOGEL.COM
202 737 8808
Party name: New England Fishermen's Stewardship Association
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142244422
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc. et amici
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
Thomas Patrick Wolf
    Counsel of Record
Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law
120 Broadway
Suite 1750
New York, NY 10271

wolft@brennan.law.nyu.edu
6462928328
Party name: Historians Gautham Rao, Richard R. John, and Jane Manners

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543